Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe (José) Negri, P.I.M.E.

Coadjutor Bishop of Santo Amaro, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1959 BornMilano, Italy
7 Dec 198526.2ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
7 Jun 198626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
14 Dec 200546.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
14 Dec 200546.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Puppi
5 Mar 200646.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Puppi
18 Feb 200949.4AppointedBishop of Blumenau, Santa Catarina, Brazil
29 Oct 201455.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santo Amaro, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe (José) Negri:
Bishop Giuseppe (José) Negri P.I.M.E. (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Santo Amaro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santo Amaro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,085
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 29 Oct 2014