Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gislon, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1957 Born
17 Oct 198023.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 May 198831.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Jun 201255.2AppointedBishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
3 Aug 201255.4Ordained BishopBishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
1 Jun 201457.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
14 Feb 201557.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
26 Jun 201962.3AppointedBishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
8 Sep 201962.5InstalledBishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Gislon
Bishop José Gislon O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Caxias do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbirama
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora das Mercês, Church, Curitiba, Archdiocese of Curitiba, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caxias do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2012
  • ob: CB, 6 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 22 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,520
  • ab: CB, 4 Jun 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast