Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girônimo Zanandréa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1936Born
Jan 1964³27.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
3 Jul 196428.0Ordained PriestPriest of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 May 197134.9IncardinatedPriest of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
16 Nov 198751.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
17 Jan 198851.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 Jan 199457.6SucceededBishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
6 Jun 201275.9RetiredBishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
3 Nov 201983.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girônimo Zanandréa
Bishop Girônimo Zanandréa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Erexim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Valentim
Ordained DeaconSão Valentim
Ordained PriestBenjamin Constant do Sul
Ordained BishopCathedral, Erexim, Diocese of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul
Death PlaceErexim, Diocese of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul
Buried Place (Original)Bishops’ section, Next to, Cathedral, Erexim, Diocese of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,523
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 4 Nov 2019
  • od/opd/loc: CB, 8 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 9 Nov 2019

Quantcast