Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Aloysio Hoffmann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1919Born
19 Dec 194324.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 196242.7AppointedBishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
10 Jun 196242.9Ordained BishopBishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 May 197151.9AppointedBishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 Jan 199474.5RetiredBishop of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Jun 199879.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Aloysio Hoffmann
Bishop João Aloysio Hoffmann (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Erexim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Leopoldo

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018