Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Trevisan, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Titular Bishop of Centuriones


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1916BornNovo Treviso
27 Dec 194226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
25 Feb 196447.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brazil, Military
25 Feb 196447.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuriones
17 May 196447.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuriones
196649.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
31 Mar 197356.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
19 Mar 199881.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alberto Trevisan:
Bishop Alberto Trevisan S.A.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013