Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santa Maria

Archidioecesis Sanctae Mariae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Hélio Adelar Rubert, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 April 2011
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rio Grande do Sul
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 21,316 (8,233 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul III
  • Web Site: http://www.diocesesantamaria.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Av. Rio Branco 793, 97010-492 Santa Maria; C.P. 17, 97001-970 Santa Maria, RS, Brazil
  • Telephone: (055)3221-6060
  • Fax: 3223-8035

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santa Maria
15 August 1910ErectedDiocese of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul Diocese of Santa Maria (erected)
10 March 1951Territory LostDiocese of Santa Maria Diocese of Passo Fundo (erected)
22 May 1961Territory LostDiocese of Passo Fundo
Diocese of Santa Maria
Diocese of Frederico Westphalen (erected)
27 May 1971Territory LostDiocese of Santa Maria Diocese of Cruz Alta (erected)
17 July 1991Territory LostDiocese of Santa Maria Diocese of Cachoeira do Sul (erected)
Archdiocese of Santa Maria
13 April 2011ElevatedDiocese of Santa Maria Archdiocese of Santa Maria

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Santa Maria
1950680,000900,00075.6%971052023,36625069084ap1951
1966730,000920,00079.3%731352083,50916058565ap1967
1968750,0001,000,00075.0%671221893,968118684564ap1971
1976480,000577,00083.2%46881343,582619859643ap1977
1980571,000614,00093.0%52761284,460824255943ap1981
1990569,000650,90087.4%61671284,4451417245648ap1991
1999375,753482,75377.8%44601043,6131115147536ap2000
2000378,000481,32878.5%45641093,4671114452436ap2001
2001380,000485,23478.3%51591103,4541813753936ap2002
2002382,800487,62578.5%49551043,6801814553536ap2003
2003383,600486,90078.8%50571073,5851810553136ap2004
2004382,247488,25878.3%47571043,6751914153536ap2005
2010400,000532,00075.2%43631063,7731412446438ap2011
Archdiocese of Santa Maria

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Jun 2014