Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walmor Battú Wichrowski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul

Titular Bishop of Phelbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1920BornIjuí
23 Dec 194525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
14 Feb 195837.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Feb 195837.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sanavus
25 May 195837.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sanavus
15 Jun 195837.6InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Apr 196039.4AppointedBishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
31 May 196140.5ResignedBishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
31 May 196140.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Phelbes
31 May 196140.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
196544.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 May 197150.5AppointedBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
16 Nov 197252.0ResignedBishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
16 Nov 197252.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Phelbes
31 Oct 200181.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Walmor Battú Wichrowski:
Bishop Walmor Battú Wichrowski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cruz Alta

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015