Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Idílio José Soares

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Vegesela in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1887Born
28 Oct 191427.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 193244.8AppointedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
30 Nov 193245.0Ordained BishopBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
12 Jun 194355.6AppointedBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Nov 196679.0ResignedBishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Nov 196679.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vegesela in Numidia
10 Dec 196982.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Idílio José Soares
Bishop Idílio José Soares (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimeira

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018