Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Campos Barreto

Deceased

Bishop of Campinas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1877BornCampinas
22 Dec 190023.7Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 May 191134.1AppointedBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
27 Aug 191134.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
22 Oct 191134.6InstalledBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
30 Jul 192043.3AppointedBishop of Campinas, Brazil
14 Nov 192043.6InstalledBishop of Campinas, Brazil
22 Aug 194164.4DiedBishop of Campinas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Campos Barreto:
Bishop Francisco de Campos Barreto (born , died ) Bishop of Campinas

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013