Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sebastião Cardinal Leme da Silveira Cintra

Deceased

Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1882BornEspirito Santo do Pinhal
28 Oct 190422.8Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Mar 191129.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Mar 191129.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
4 Jun 191129.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
29 Apr 191634.3AppointedArchbishop of Olinda, Brazil
15 Mar 192139.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
15 Mar 192139.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
18 Apr 193048.2SucceededArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 Jun 193048.4Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jul 193048.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Bonifacio ed Alessio
17 Oct 194260.7DiedArchbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Leme da Silveira Cintra:
Cardinal Sebastião Leme da Silveira Cintra (born , died ) Archbishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
  • a cardinal for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013