Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Ramos de Castro Vilela

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nazaré, Pernambuco

Titular Bishop of Antipyrgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1887BornOlinda
20 Nov 191023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Olinda, Brazil
3 Jul 191932.3AppointedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
7 Sep 191932.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
19 Oct 191932.5InstalledBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
16 Aug 194659.4ResignedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
16 Aug 194659.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipyrgos
8 Aug 195871.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Ramos de Castro Vilela:
Bishop Ricardo Ramos de Castro Vilela (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nazaré

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013