Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João José da Mota e Albuquerque

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1913BornRecife
28 Apr 193522.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jan 195743.7AppointedBishop of Afogados da Ingazeira, Pernambuco, Brazil
28 Apr 195744.0Ordained BishopBishop of Afogados da Ingazeira, Pernambuco, Brazil
28 Feb 196147.9AppointedBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
28 Apr 196451.0AppointedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
20 Mar 198470.9ResignedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
12 Sep 198774.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João José da Mota e Albuquerque:
Archbishop João José da Mota e Albuquerque (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015