Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Hélio Campos

Deceased

Bishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1912Born
5 Aug 193725.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 196956.7AppointedBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
6 Jul 196956.9Ordained BishopBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
23 Jan 197562.4DiedBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Hélio Campos
Bishop Francisco Hélio Campos (born , died ) Bishop of Viana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItatira

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018