Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Austregésilo de Mesquita Filho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Afogados da Ingazeira, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1924Born
8 Dec 195127.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
25 May 196137.1AppointedBishop of Afogados da Ingazeira, Pernambuco, Brazil
24 Aug 196137.3Ordained BishopBishop of Afogados da Ingazeira, Pernambuco, Brazil
13 Jun 200177.1RetiredBishop of Afogados da Ingazeira, Pernambuco, Brazil
7 Oct 200682.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Afogados da Ingazeira, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Austregésilo de Mesquita Filho
Bishop Francisco Austregésilo de Mesquita Filho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Afogados da Ingazeira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReriutaba

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast