Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adelmo Cavalcante Machado

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Maceió, Alagoas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1905BornPenedo
4 Dec 192722.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 194843.1AppointedBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
15 Aug 194843.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
24 Jun 195550.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
24 Jun 195550.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Leontopolis in Pamphylia
19 Oct 196358.6SucceededArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
24 Nov 197671.7ResignedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
28 Nov 198378.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adelmo Cavalcante Machado:
Archbishop Adelmo Cavalcante Machado (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maceió

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 30 Nov 2013