Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis do Amaral Mousinho

Deceased

Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1912Born
27 Mar 193724.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 194835.7AppointedBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
28 Nov 194836.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
18 Mar 195239.3AppointedBishop of Ribeirão Preto, Brazil
19 Apr 195845.4AppointedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Apr 196249.4DiedArchbishop of Ribeirão Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luis do Amaral Mousinho
Archbishop Luis do Amaral Mousinho (born , died ) Archbishop of Ribeirão Preto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTimbaúba

  • a priest for 25.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 127
  • ab/r103: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1958, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018