Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geraldo María de Morais Penido

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Aparecida, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1918BornRio Manso de Bonfim
4 Apr 194223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Mar 195637.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Mar 195637.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Avissa
11 May 195637.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avissa
30 Nov 195739.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Juiz de Fora, Brazil
9 Jun 195839.8SucceededBishop of Juiz de Fora, Brazil
14 Apr 196243.6AppointedArchbishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Dec 197759.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
18 Sep 198264.0SucceededArchbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 Jul 199576.8RetiredArchbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Nov 200284.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo María de Morais Penido:
Archbishop Geraldo María de Morais Penido (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Aparecida

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 38
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014