Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Fré, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barretos, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1924BornCerquilho
27 Dec 195026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
28 Oct 198561.1AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
5 Jan 198661.3Ordained BishopBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
2 Dec 198965.2AppointedBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Dec 200076.3RetiredBishop of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Apr 201489.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Barretos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Fré:
Bishop Pedro Fré C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barretos

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 3 Apr 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015