Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislau Paz, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1903BornTaubaté
3 Jul 193229.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Jul 195552.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
21 Jul 195552.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
12 Oct 195552.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
28 Nov 195754.4AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
5 Jul 197875.0RetiredBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
24 Jun 199490.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ladislau Paz:
Bishop Ladislau Paz S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Corumbá

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015