Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Alagna Foderá, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1913BornMarsala, Italy
8 Dec 194229.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Jun 196754.3AppointedPrelate of Rio Negro, Amazonas, Brazil
13 Jun 196754.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
24 Aug 196754.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
26 May 197865.3ResignedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
5 Mar 198168.1AppointedBishop of Rio Negro, Brazil
27 Feb 198875.0RetiredBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
11 Jan 200288.9DiedBishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Michele Alagna Foderá:
Bishop Michele Alagna Foderá S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015