Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Altivo Pacheco Ribeiro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais

Titular Bishop of Aliezira

Auxiliary Bishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1916BornCataguases-Minas Gerais
8 Dec 194832.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 196346.9AppointedBishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil
11 Jun 196347.0Ordained BishopBishop of Barra do Piraí, Brazil
27 Jun 196650.1AppointedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Nov 197357.5ResignedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Nov 197357.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aliezira
10 Nov 197357.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais, Brazil
13 Jun 198771.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Altivo Pacheco Ribeiro:
Bishop Altivo Pacheco Ribeiro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Araçuaí (Arassuaí)

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013