Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora

Archidioecesis Iudiciforensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gil Antônio Moreira, Archbishop
  • Clóvis Frainer, O.F.M. Cap., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Eurico dos Santos Veloso, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 April 1962
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Minas Gerais
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 10,757 (4,154 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Leste II
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesejuizdefora.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Arcebispado, Rua Henrique Surerus 30, 36010-030 Juiz de Fora, MG, Brazil
  • Telephone: (032)3215-4214
  • Fax: 3215-3404

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Juiz de Fora
1 February 1924ErectedArchdiocese of Mariana Diocese of Juiz de Fora (erected)
Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora
28 March 1942Territory LostArchdiocese of Juiz de Fora
Archdiocese of Mariana
Diocese of Leopoldina (erected)
14 April 1962ElevatedDiocese of Juiz de Fora Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Juiz de Fora
1948550,000558,00098.6%4743906,1114316055ap1951
Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora
1962409,000409,75299.8%55751303,1467537760ap1967
1970637,500650,00098.1%80591394,5869046067ap1971
1976570,000600,00095.0%66601264,5238032570ap1977
1980443,488554,36180.0%56581143,89019120165ap1981
1990468,000585,00080.0%58501084,333211513369ap1991
1999515,000644,00080.0%77491264,087111318381ap2000
2000520,300650,41480.0%73451184,40918820185ap2001
2001524,000655,00080.0%75451204,36619420685ap2003
2003533,000667,00079.9%73451184,51619212085ap2004
2004533,000667,00079.9%75451204,44119413280ap2005
2006540,000676,00079.9%81451264,285159413287ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014