Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justino José de Sant’Ana

Deceased

Bishop of Juiz de Fora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1878BornAramarí
1 Nov 190425.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 192445.5AppointedBishop of Juiz de Fora, Brazil
20 Jan 192546.1Ordained BishopBishop of Juiz de Fora, Brazil
9 Jun 195879.4DiedBishop of Juiz de Fora, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Justino José de Sant’Ana:
Bishop Justino José de Sant’Ana (born , died ) Bishop of Juiz de Fora

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015