Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Gasparri

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Bishop of Velletri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1871Born
10 Aug 189423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
13 Nov 191544.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
9 Dec 191544.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
12 Dec 191544.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
8 May 191644.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Colombia
20 Jul 191745.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
1 Sep 192049.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
14 Dec 192554.3Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 192554.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
17 Dec 192554.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
18 May 193361.8AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
16 Oct 193362.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Velletri
20 May 194674.8DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Enrico Gasparri (VIAF: 89103801)
Enrico Cardinal Gasparri (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUssita, Diocese of Norcia, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
  • a cardinal for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 78
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1925
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 334
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 80, and Page 81, and Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast