Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Ermini

Deceased

Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1856BornRoma
20 Sep 187922.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Mar 188023.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 190852.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina, Italy
30 Dec 190852.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hamatha
31 Jan 190952.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hamatha
23 Apr 191053.4AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
4 Dec 191458.0AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
13 Jun 192164.5AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
16 May 194588.4DiedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ermini:
Bishop Luigi Ermini (born , died ) Bishop of Fabriano e Matelica

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 50, and Page 101
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014