Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tito Trocchi

Deceased

Official of the Apostolic Chamber

Titular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1864BornRoma, Italy
24 Sep 188723.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 191551.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
9 Dec 191551.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Cuba
12 Dec 191551.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lacedaemonia
25 May 192157.1AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Bolivia
1924²59.7ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Bolivia
11 Jan 192762.7AppointedOfficial of the Apostolic Chamber
12 Feb 194782.8DiedOfficial of the Apostolic Chamber

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tito Trocchi:
Archbishop Tito Trocchi (born , died ) Official of Apostolic Chamber

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013