Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Gomes de Oliveira, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Goiás


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1874BornAnchieta
16 Jun 190127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Oct 192248.8AppointedBishop of Goiás, Brazil
15 Apr 192349.3Ordained BishopBishop of Goiás, Brazil
18 Nov 193258.9AppointedArchbishop of Goiás, Brazil
12 May 195581.3DiedArchbishop of Goiás, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Gomes de Oliveira:
Archbishop Manuel Gomes de Oliveira S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Goiás

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013