Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abel Ribeiro Camelo

Deceased

Bishop of Goiás, Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1902BornSilvania
8 May 192724.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 194643.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goiás, Brazil
6 Jul 194643.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
27 Oct 194644.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curium
17 Jan 195754.3AppointedBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
14 May 196057.6AppointedBishop of Goiás, Goias, Brazil
24 Nov 196664.2DiedBishop of Goiás, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Abel Ribeiro Camelo:
Bishop Abel Ribeiro Camelo (born , died ) Bishop of Goiás

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013