Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Selva e Amaral, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prelate of Registro do Araguaia

Titular Bishop of Metrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1886BornCortenova, Italy
18 Jan 191427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Dec 193751.1AppointedPrelate of Registro do Araguaia, Brazil
27 Dec 193751.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Metrae
24 Apr 193851.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metrae
13 Aug 195669.8DiedPrelate of Registro do Araguaia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Selva e Amaral:
Bishop José Selva e Amaral S.D.B. (born , died ) Prelate of Registro do Araguaia

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013