Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Batista Costa, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Porto Velho, Rondonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1902BornLuiz Alves
9 Jul 193330.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 Oct 194643.7AppointedPrelate of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
1 Oct 194643.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
30 Nov 194643.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scilium
26 May 197875.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Scilium
4 Dec 197976.9AppointedBishop of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
9 Jun 198279.4RetiredBishop of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
17 Apr 199693.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Batista Costa:
Bishop João Batista Costa S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto Velho

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015