Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Jovêncio Balestieri, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1939 BornMassaranduba
29 Jun 196829.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
6 Mar 199151.8AppointedBishop of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil
19 May 199152.0Ordained BishopBishop of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil
29 Jul 199859.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil
30 Aug 200061.3SucceededBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil
19 Mar 200868.8ResignedBishop of Rio do Sul, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Jovêncio Balestieri:
Bishop José Jovêncio Balestieri S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rio do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rio do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,636
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Mar 2014