Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Josef Meinrad Merkel, C.S.Sp.

Bishop Emeritus of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1944 Born
22 May 197126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
26 Jul 200055.8AppointedBishop of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil
15 Oct 200056.0Ordained BishopBishop of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil
12 Aug 202075.8RetiredBishop of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Franz Josef Meinrad Merkel
Bishop Franz Josef Meinrad Merkel C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Humaitá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHardheim
Ordained BishopGinásio de Esportes, Humaitá, Diocese of Humaitá, Amazonas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Humaitá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,853
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast