Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Porto Velho

Archidioecesis Portus Veteris



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Esmeraldo Barreto de Farias, Ist. del Prado, Archbishop
  • Moacyr Grechi, O.S.M., Archbishop Emeritus
  • José Martins da Silva, S.D.N., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 October 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rondonia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 84,696 (32,713 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte I
  • Mailing Address: Curia Metropolitana, Rua Goncalves Dias 288, C.P. 232, 78900-970 Porto Velho, RO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (069)3221-2270
  • Fax: 3224-1590

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho
1 May 1925ErectedDiocese of Amazonas
Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho (erected)
1 March 1929Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Porto Velho
Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres
Territorial Prelature of Guajará-Mirim (erected)
26 June 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Manaus
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho
Territorial Prelature of Humaitá (erected)
3 January 1978Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Guajará-Mirim
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho
Territorial Prelature of Vila Rondônia (erected)
Diocese of Porto Velho
16 October 1979ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Porto Velho Diocese of Porto Velho
Archdiocese of Porto Velho
4 October 1982ElevatedDiocese of Porto Velho Archdiocese of Porto Velho

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho
194945,000100,00045.0%10104,50015262ap1951
1966240,000250,00096.0%141417,1424264ap1967
1970180,000180,000100.0%5ap1971
1976291,000300,00097.0%3202312,652232410ap1977
Diocese of Porto Velho
1980177,000185,40095.5%317208,850222917ap1981
Archdiocese of Porto Velho
1990212,000221,00095.9%1024346,2351294622ap1991
1999432,970463,95093.3%10334310,0692856327ap2000
2000598,000664,95889.9%7222920,6201656328ap2004

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 13 Nov 2012