Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Guajará-Mirim

Dioecesis Guaiaramirensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Porto Velho
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rondonia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 89,700 (34,646 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte I
  • Official Web Site: http://dgm.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Av. Costa Marques 571, 78957-000 Guajara-Mirim, RO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (069)3541-2275
  • Fax: 3541-3030

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Guajará-Mirim
1 March 1929ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Porto Velho
Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres
Territorial Prelature of Guajará-Mirim (erected)
3 January 1978Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Guajará-Mirim
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho
Territorial Prelature of Vila Rondônia (erected)
Diocese of Guajará-Mirim
16 October 1979ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Guajará-Mirim Diocese of Guajará-Mirim

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Guajará-Mirim
195010,00015,00066.7%661,666674ap1951
196625,20030,00084.0%5273,6004103ap1967
196830,200.0%42604113ap1971
197632,00040,00080.0%4265,33310143ap1977
Diocese of Guajará-Mirim
198065,60082,40079.6%51610,9332115ap1981
1990170,000186,00091.4%2131511,333153318ap1991
1999169,000243,00069.5%812208,450144511ap2000
2000188,000246,00076.4%1012228,545144111ap2001
2001179,350211,00085.0%1010208,967124411ap2002
2002119,250170,25070.0%109196,276114711ap2003
2003125,579167,43875.0%99186,976115011ap2004
2004135,666203,50066.7%89177,980105411ap2005
2006130,200218,50059.6%59149,300103714ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014