Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Pinheiro

Bishop Emeritus of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1938 BornNazaré Paulista
27 Dec 196426.4Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 Feb 199758.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
12 Feb 199758.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
19 Apr 199758.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
6 Aug 200365.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
9 Mar 200566.6AppointedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
8 May 200566.8InstalledBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Sep 200971.1ResignedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José María Pinheiro:
Bishop José María Pinheiro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bragança Paulista

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bragança Paulista.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Sep 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013