Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Gamberini

Deceased

Archbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1950BornMatão
11 Dec 197424.4Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 May 199544.8AppointedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Jul 199545.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Aug 199545.1InstalledBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 Jun 200453.9AppointedArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
1 Aug 200454.0InstalledArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Aug 201161.1DiedArchbishop of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Bruno Gamberini:
Archbishop Bruno Gamberini (born , died ) Archbishop of Campinas

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • d: CB, 28 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,574
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013