Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Carlos Cipolini

Bishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1952 BornCaconde
25 Feb 197825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Feb 198734.8IncardinatedPriest of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Jul 201058.1AppointedBishop of Amparo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 Oct 201058.4Ordained BishopBishop of Amparo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Oct 201058.4InstalledBishop of Amparo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 May 201563.0AppointedBishop of Santo André, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Carlos Cipolini:
Bishop Pedro Carlos Cipolini (born ) Bishop of Santo André

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santo André.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,859
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 27 May 2015