Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Carlos da Silva

Bishop of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1955 BornTabatinga
11 Dec 198227.1Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Sep 200751.9AppointedBishop of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Nov 200752.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ituiutaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Carlos da Silva:
Bishop Francisco Carlos da Silva (born ) Bishop of Ituiutaba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ituiutaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • c1: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,564

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015