Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeremias Antônio de Jesus

Bishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1966 BornAtibaia
10 Dec 199327.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 May 201246.0AppointedBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 Aug 201246.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Aug 201246.2InstalledBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jeremias Antônio de Jesus:
Bishop Jeremias Antônio de Jesus (born ) Bishop of Guanhães

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guanhães.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 May 2012
  • ob/i: CB, 30 May 2012
  • c2+: CB, 1 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,522

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013