Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sérgio Aparecido Colombo

Bishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1954 BornCajobi
6 Aug 198025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Oct 200147.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Oct 200147.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
6 Jan 200247.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pudentiana
1 Feb 200247.4InstalledAuxiliary Bishop of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Dec 200349.3AppointedBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
1 Feb 200449.4InstalledBishop of Paranavaí, Parana, Brazil
16 Sep 200955.0AppointedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sérgio Aparecido Colombo:
Bishop Sérgio Aparecido Colombo (born ) Bishop of Bragança Paulista

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bragança Paulista.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Sep 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013