Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ercílio Turco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1938Born
1 Dec 196325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Campinas, Sao Paulo, Brazil
18 Nov 198951.6AppointedBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 Feb 199051.8Ordained BishopBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
8 Feb 199051.9InstalledBishop of Limeira, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Apr 200264.1AppointedBishop of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Jun 200264.2InstalledBishop of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Apr 201476.0RetiredBishop of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Oct 201981.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ercílio Turco
Bishop Ercílio Turco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Osasco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampinas, Diocese of Campinas
Ordained PriestCampinas, Archdiocese of Campinas, Sao Paulo
Ordained BishopS. José, Church, Moji Mirim
Death Placeda Luz, Hospital, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,059
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2014
  • d/i/c1: CB, 30 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 1 Nov 2019

Quantcast