Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcello Romano

Bishop Emeritus of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1965 Born
24 Jun 199428.8Ordained PriestPriest of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
13 Jun 201246.8AppointedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Sep 201247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Mar 202054.6ResignedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Marcello Romano
Bishop Marcello Romano (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Araçuaí (Arassuaí)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConceição do Mato Dentro
Ordained Bishopsur la place du Sanctuaire, Conceição do Mato Dentro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2012
  • ob: CB, 18 Jun 2012
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,535
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 25 Mar 2020

Quantcast