Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emanuel Messias de Oliveira

Bishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1948 BornSalinas
4 Feb 197627.7Ordained PriestPriest of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Jan 199849.7AppointedBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Apr 199849.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guanhães, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Feb 201162.8AppointedBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
20 May 201163.0InstalledBishop of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Emanuel Messias de Oliveira:
Bishop Emanuel Messias de Oliveira (born ) Bishop of Caratinga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caratinga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,270
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015