Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Heleno

Bishop Emeritus of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1927 Born
30 Nov 195225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Jul 197648.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 Oct 197648.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Dec 197750.0SucceededBishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Apr 200173.4ResignedBishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Heleno
Bishop José Heleno (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Governador Valadares

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCipotânea, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Governador Valadares.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast