Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Eduardo Marskell, S.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1935BornHamilton, Canada
21 Aug 196024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Scarboro Foreign Mission Society
197539.1AppointedPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil
5 May 197842.5AppointedPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil
30 Jul 197842.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil
2 Jul 199862.7DiedPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jorge Eduardo Marskell:
Bishop Jorge Eduardo Marskell S.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate of Itacoatiara

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013