Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Paul McHugh, S.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Legis Volumni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1924Born
8 Dec 195430.2Ordained PriestPriest of Scarboro Foreign Mission Society
20 Jul 196540.9AppointedPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil
4 Aug 196742.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Legis Volumni
3 Oct 196743.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legis Volumni
15 Jul 197247.9ResignedPrelate of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil
6 May 200378.7DiedPrelate Emeritus of Itacoatiara, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francis Paul McHugh
Bishop Francis Paul McHugh S.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Itacoatiara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoodslee, Canada

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast