Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aloysius Matthew Cardinal Ambrozic

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1930BornGabrje, Yugoslavia
4 Jun 195525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
26 Mar 197646.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
26 Mar 197646.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Valabria
27 May 197646.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Valabria
22 May 198656.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
17 Mar 199060.1SucceededArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
21 Feb 199868.0Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199868.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
4 Oct 199868.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
16 Dec 200676.8RetiredArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
26 Aug 201181.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Matthew Ambrozic:
Aloysius Matthew Cardinal Ambrozic (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Toronto

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
  • a cardinal for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2006
  • i: Bollettino, 29 Sep 1998
  • d: CB, 26 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015