Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stephen Knight

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toronto, Ontario

Titular Bishop of Taraqua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1942 BornBinghamton, NY, USA
2 Jun 196725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
27 Apr 199250.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
27 Apr 199250.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Taraqua
24 Jun 199250.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taraqua
9 Apr 200058.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Stephen Knight:
Bishop John Stephen Knight (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toronto

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Toronto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,685

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013