Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph McCarthy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1905Born
25 May 192923.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 195549.5AppointedBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
1 Aug 195549.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
9 Nov 195853.0AppointedBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
25 Nov 195853.1InstalledBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
7 Jul 197872.7ResignedBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
15 Nov 198681.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph McCarthy
Bishop Thomas Joseph McCarthy (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoderich

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast