Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Anthony Boissonneau

Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Tambeae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1949 Born
14 Dec 197425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
23 Mar 200151.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
23 Mar 200151.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tambeae
29 May 200151.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tambeae

MicroData Summary for John Anthony Boissonneau
Bishop John Anthony Boissonneau (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScarborough

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Toronto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,980

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018